Trustees THORNTON HEATH EVANGELICAL CHURCH
Charity number: 1130780

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Patrick John Ridgeway | Chair | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gary Calvin George Orlebar | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Clifford Harries | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Randy Obaze | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucio Dente | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ANTHONY BRISTOW | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
SIMON MARK HARRIS | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
BRICE FRANCK VICTOR HADJARD | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
DIPAK CHIMANLAL DAMANI | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
EDGAR CONRAD POWELL | Trustee | 12 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
IAN EDWARD WHYBROW | Trustee | 12 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP JOHN TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.