THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WRAXALL WITH FAILAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. Provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved. Teaching and promoting christianity. Promoting the whole mission of the Church through the provision of activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers and special need groups. Supporting charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £300 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North Somerset
Governance
- 09 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
- PCC OF WRAXALL WITH FAILAND (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr PETER JOHN HEARD | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Morey Alisdair Christopher Andrews | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Robert Sheppard | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Christine Sage | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
John Sidney Stevens | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Phillips | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MEG CATON | Trustee | 07 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BIRD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EILEEN OATES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUE IRWIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.31k | £105.75k | £142.19k | £118.69k | £120.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £96.41k | £112.05k | £153.22k | £131.08k | £127.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £300 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 December 2024 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 December 2024 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 March 2022 | 137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 March 2022 | 137 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wraxall Church Parish Office
Bristol Road
Wraxall
BRISTOL
BS48 1LB
- Phone:
- 01275 852442
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window