THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARGARET OF ANTIOCH, LEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church of England parochial church council
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

23 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lewisham
Governance
- 15 October 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARGARET'S LEE PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON BLACKBURN | Chair | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Manuela Marianne Schmucki | Trustee | 15 September 2024 |
|
|||||||||
ANDREW WARDLE | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Josef Herman | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Ben Johnson | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Alistair Higgins | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Catherine Clay | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Christine Speller | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Michael Rae | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Joan Burkitt-Gray | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Bianca Johnson | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Mbessan Sarr | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Joanne Woodall | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|||||||||
David Stanley Knight | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Nakessa Morgan | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Daniel Walker | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Duncan Atkinson | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Robin Quinnell | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
TAMSIN GRIEM | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
LESLEY PALGRAVE | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|||||||||
BILL BISHOP | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
MARION BARBARA SCOTT | Trustee | 30 October 2012 |
|
|||||||||
JENNY STANDAGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £295.33k | £198.64k | £648.30k | £341.45k | £310.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £291.07k | £287.28k | £452.26k | £350.29k | £398.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £9.30k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £535.16k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £24.86k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £80.56k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £7.72k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £410.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £449.03k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £3.23k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 November 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 November 2024 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 March 2023 | 122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 March 2023 | 122 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Margarets Visitor Centre
Brandram Road
LONDON
SE13 5EA
- Phone:
- 0208 318 9643
- Email:
- office@stmargaretslee.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window