Financial history PORTOBELLO COMMUNITY FORUM

Charity number: 1139980
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £19.22k £38.56k £40.50k £45.97k £81.16k
Total expenditure £17.75k £27.31k £49.39k £50.50k £69.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.10k £9.00k £7.50k £37.99k