DOWNTON BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sharing God's love in the local community, through word and action. Being an inclusive, welcoming, worshipping community centred on the Holy Scriptures. Our Mission statement motto is 'Knowing Jesus Christ and making Him known' and we seek to encourage a faith journey for young and old, male and female regardless of previous experience or none.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £1,432 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 18 August 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Naomi Michaela Lloyd-Jones | Chair | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Edward KING | Trustee | 16 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Muriel Stafford | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Renate James | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diane Elizabeth Bugden | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARTIN JOHN BRUETON | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jean Ivens-Smith | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Katy Margaret ULLYATT | Trustee | 12 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ian Douglas MITCHELL | Trustee | 22 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
REV PHILIP RHOADES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £164.69k | £168.98k | £141.68k | £145.59k | £172.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £148.60k | £137.56k | £184.55k | £165.53k | £176.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.85k | N/A | £1.43k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 January 2024 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 JANUARY 2009 AS AMENDED ON 22/11/2015
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Downton Baptist Church
South Lane
Downton
SALISBURY
SP5 3NA
- Phone:
- 01725512971
- Email:
- office@downtonbaptist.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window