REDLAND PARK UNITED REFORMED CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religous Worship and Community Outreach
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
Governance
- 02 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
- REDLAND PARK URC (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV DOUGLAS BURNETT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Derek Stewart Jones | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Matthew Andrew Sims | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Myra Elizabeth Jones | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angus Gregson | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alison Patricia Hooper | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Margaret Fry | Trustee | 17 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Truida Laura Mutare | Trustee | 17 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Brentley | Trustee | 17 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Hayden | Trustee | 01 May 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137.36k | £181.37k | £130.89k | £130.89k | £112.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £154.18k | £204.44k | £126.60k | £126.60k | £157.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 182 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 182 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUSTS DISTILLED FROM THE UNITED REFORM CHURCH ACTS OF PARLIAMENT (1972 AND 1982) AND THE SCHEME OF UNION (1972)
Charitable objects
The object of the Charity is the advancement of the Christian faith for the benefit of the public in accordance with the Scheme of Union of the United Reformed Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
88 BERKELEY ROAD
BISHOPSTON
BRISTOL
BS7 8HG
- Phone:
- 01179241063
- Email:
- lesjfry@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window