MANSE FOR THE MINISTER OF BETHANY BAPTIST CHAPEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides a house (manse) for the use of the minister of Abergavenny Baptist Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Monmouthshire
Governance
- 29 October 1970: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Richard Hayward | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Petrus Johannes Eksteen | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Joanna Louise Nugent | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Joy Robinson | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Katherine Kippax | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Anne Irene Wilde | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Rev Michael Ian Orsmond | Trustee | 01 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
Mary ANDERSON | Trustee | 01 September 2008 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCES DATED 20 MAY 1957 AND 1 OCTOBER 1970
Charitable objects
A DWELLINGHOUSE, TO BE USED OCCUPIED AND ENJOYED BY OR UNDER THE DIRECTION OR MANAGEMENT OF THE CHURCH, FOR THE STATED MINISTER FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE BETHANY BAPTIST CHAPEL, ABERGAVENNY.
Area of benefit
ABERGAVENNY
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 THE CEDARS
LLANFOIST
ABERGAVENNY
NP7 9LX
- Phone:
- 01873854737
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window