Accounts and annual returns Imdadiyyah

Charity number: 1133409
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 10 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 May 2024 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 February 2022 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required