THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SS MARY AND THOMAS OF CANTERBURY, WYMONDHAM WITH SILFIELD AND SPOONER ROW

Charity Number: 1130495
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The promotion of the Gospel of our Lord Jesus Christ according to the doctrines and practices of the Church of England. The PCC is required to co-operate with the Minister in promoting in the parish the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £376,323
Total expenditure: £276,788

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • WYMONDHAM ABBEY PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Graham John Shelton Trustee 10 May 2025
None on record
Rev Andrew Charles Hammond Trustee 12 September 2024
REVEREND WILLIAM PAPILLON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Iain Alfred Drayton Trustee 20 April 2024
None on record
Hilary Frances Hunter Trustee 20 April 2024
None on record
Diana Margaret Grant Trustee 20 April 2024
THE WYMONDHAM HERITAGE SOCIETY
Received: On time
WYMONDHAM ABBEY PRESERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
John Martyn Chamberlain Trustee 20 April 2024
FRIENDS OF WYMONDHAM ABBEY
Received: On time
Isabel Louise Davidson Trustee 04 March 2023
None on record
Dr David Valentine Hamilton Trustee 04 March 2023
None on record
Barbara Joan Randall Trustee 04 March 2023
None on record
Christopher James Grant Trustee 30 October 2022
THE WYMONDHAM HERITAGE SOCIETY
Received: On time
William James Hartley Trustee 17 July 2022
None on record
Brian Peter Marcus Randall Trustee 17 July 2022
None on record
Alex Perry Trustee 29 May 2022
None on record
Philip Sydney Aldred Trustee 01 March 2020
None on record
Kathleen Melvill Dorling Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Catherine Sian Mack Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Andrew Richard Naylor Trustee 28 April 2019
WYMONDHAM SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £233.49k £248.64k £102.52k £135.94k £376.32k
Total expenditure £285.57k £318.27k £205.52k £168.80k £276.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A £2.00k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 01 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 March 2023 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 08 March 2023 128 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Wymondham Abbey
Church Street
Wymondham
NR18 0PH
Phone:
01953 605671