THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAULS, ADDLESTONE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious services and activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
130 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 12 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST PAULS PCC, ADDLESTONE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV BEN BEECROFT | Chair |
|
||||||
Julie Helen Parker | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ronan Stephen McCaughey | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheila May Bardell | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gary Madden | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Lane | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Bernard Meyer | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Christine Beecroft | Trustee | 13 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mary Perrior | Trustee | 12 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Myers | Trustee | 12 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARA HARDING | Trustee | 23 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR WILLIAM LEWIS BSC | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £155.64k | £156.36k | £157.04k | £182.37k | £235.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £178.13k | £151.05k | £150.82k | £178.38k | £228.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 November 2022 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 March 2022 | 145 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 March 2022 | 145 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Parish Office
St. Pauls Church
School Lane
ADDLESTONE
Surrey
KT15 1TB
- Phone:
- 01932 846059
- Email:
- info@stpaulscofe.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window