Financial history THE MUDLARKS COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1132403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £644.41k £760.67k £770.65k £807.65k £791.44k
Total expenditure £556.54k £645.27k £680.42k £854.39k £873.25k
Income from government contracts £260.15k £444.98k £558.56k £143.19k £132.93k
Income from government grants £16.17k £94.27k £44.34k £4.20k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £35.97k £232.01k £140.62k £94.86k £81.81k
Income - Other trading activities £16.43k £0 £0 £0 £18.40k
Income - Charitable activities £419.38k £527.61k £627.85k £698.90k £688.14k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £247 £166 £115 £1.14k £3.09k
Income - Other £172.38k £887 £2.06k £12.75k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £544.40k £638.79k £675.46k £850.94k £863.25k
Expenditure - Raising funds £12.13k £6.48k £4.95k £3.45k £7.16k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £1.60k £1.68k £1.71k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.84k