Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHESTER ST PAULS WITH ST LUKES
Charity number: 1130604

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Andrew James Stinson | Chair | 30 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr KEITH EDWARD GREGORY | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Lilian Gilbertson | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|||||
John Edward Somerville | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Clive Roy Poyser | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Victoria Williams | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Caroline Davies | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Jeffrey Anthony Polton | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Paul Williams | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Keith Gregory | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.