Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BUSHEY

Charity number: 1130540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £232.71k £173.81k £251.16k £197.51k £213.91k
Total expenditure £263.87k £238.81k £254.51k £251.71k £248.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £3.06k £2.10k