BHP BILLITON SUSTAINABLE COMMUNITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FOCUSES ON A SMALL NUMBER OF LARGE SCALE PROJECTS: FLAGSHIP MDG PROGRAMS, NATIONAL PROJECTS AND DONATIONS, NATURAL DISASTER RELIEF AND DONATIONS TO CHARITIES AS PART OF THE BHP BILLITON MATCHED GIVING PROGRAM (NB: THE CHARITY WILL NOT CONTINUE FUNDING MATCHING GRANTS AFTER 1 JULY 2015).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of Westminster
- Australia
- Brazil
- Cambodia
- Canada
- Chile
- China
- Colombia
- Dominican Republic
- Indonesia
- Japan
- Mozambique
- Netherlands
- Pakistan
- Singapore
- South Africa
- Switzerland
- Thailand
- United States
Governance
- 10 August 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brianda Bugge-Mahrt | Trustee | 16 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Charles Simpson | Trustee | 16 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.58k | £9.62k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.86k | £954.93k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 09 July 2024 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/05/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/07/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/08/2012
Charitable objects
1.THE RELIEF OF HARDSHIP EXPERIENCED AS A RESULT OF, BUT NOT LIMITED TO A) ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE B) NATURAL DISASTER, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EMERGENCY ASSISTANCE, MEDIUM OR LONGER TERM RECONSTRUCTION AND REBUILDING C)SOCIAL CONFLICT AND DISPLACEMENT D) GEOGRAPHIC OR DISTANCE DISADVANTAGE EXPERIENCED BY COMMUNITIES IN RURAL AND REMOTE AREAS. (2) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF SOCIALLY AND/OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) STRENGTHENING CIVIL SOCIETY (B) BUILDING GOVERNANCE CAPACITY (C) ADVOCACY AND LEADERSHIP, AND (D) SUPPORTING RESEARCH AND POLICY ON GOVERNANCE ISSUES INCLUDING TRANSPARENCY AND CORRUPTION; IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY (3) TO PROMOTE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF TRADITIONAL CULTURE AND HERITAGE BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) PRESERVING TRADITIONAL LANGUAGE AND KNOWLEDGE (B) INCREASING AWARENESS OF CULTURAL TRADITIONS 4.THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SUPPORT OF SUSTAINABLE LIVELIHOODS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD BY ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS A) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE AND SUPPORT FOR SMALL BUSINESS AND ENTERPRISE DEVELOPMENT B) INITIATIVES TO ADDRESS UNEMPLOYMENT INCLUDING VOCATIONAL EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE C) INITIATIVES THAT ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO BECOME SELF-SUFFICIENT D) INITIATIVES TO EMPOWER DISADVANTAGED GROUPS TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE EFFECTIVELY IN SOCIETY AND TAKE ADVANTAGE OF ECONOMIC OPPORTUNITIES AND E) SUSTAINABLE URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION INITIATIVES 5. TO PROMOTE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND WELL-BEING AND THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF DISEASE 6. TO PROMOTE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT 7. TO SUPPORT AND PROMOTE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, RESEARCH AND EDUCATION WITH A FOCUS ON THE FIELDS OF SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY, ENGINEERING AND SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND 8.SUCH OTHER OBJECTS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION FOR ENGLAND AND WALES’.
Area of benefit
THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
NOVA SOUTH
160 VICTORIA STREET
LONDON
SW1E 5LB
- Phone:
- (44 20) 7802 4000
- Email:
- enquiries@bhpbilliton.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window