THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, BARNSTAPLE

Charity number: 1130331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The primary object of the PCC is to promote the Gospel of the Lord Jesus Christ according to the doctrines and practices of the Church of England

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £280,004
Total expenditure: £209,163

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 June 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • HOLY TRINITY CHURCH (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julie Marie Griffin Trustee 15 April 2024
None on record
Roger Edwin Dadswell-Boyton Trustee 15 April 2024
None on record
Louise Michelle Kevan Trustee 15 May 2023
None on record
Suzanne Melanie Pentney-Tighe Trustee 15 May 2023
None on record
ANDREW JOHN KEENAN Trustee 10 November 2020
None on record
Rev Paul Jeremy Taylor Trustee 02 November 2020
None on record
DAVID GEOFFREY ARCHER Trustee 12 October 2020
WINGS SOUTH WEST
Received: On time
Rachel Keenan Trustee 16 September 2019
None on record
Margaret Nobbs Trustee 13 May 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £216.87k £201.94k £242.26k £265.88k £280.00k
Total expenditure £200.92k £208.01k £257.97k £259.89k £209.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.50k N/A £1.00k £2.47k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 26 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 10 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HOLY TRINITY CHURCH
BARBICAN TERRACE
BARNSTAPLE
NORTH DEVON
EX32 9HQ
Phone:
01271374240