Accounts and annual returns THE MERCIFUL HANDS

Charity number: 1133282
Charity reporting is overdue by 762 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 31 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 31 days
Annual return 31 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 396 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 396 days
Annual return 31 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 762 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 762 days
Annual return 31 May 2021 29 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 29 July 2021 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required