Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF MARSKE IN CLEVELAND

Charity number: 1132705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Julie Lesley Smith Chair 06 August 2023
None on record
Maureen Taylor Trustee 05 January 2025
None on record
Carol Anne Anderson Trustee 21 May 2023
None on record
Jack Colin George Thomas Trustee 10 April 2022
None on record
Laura Maskery Trustee 10 October 2020
None on record
Jonathon Paul Bragg Trustee 29 April 2018
None on record
Susan Anne Thompson Trustee 26 April 2015
None on record
Andrew Fox Trustee 06 April 2014
None on record
DR JANET ELIZABETH DACK Trustee 17 April 2012
None on record
SUSAN SOTHERAN Trustee
None on record
CLARE MARSHALL Trustee
None on record
PETER TINKLER Trustee
None on record
MARGARET TINKLER Trustee
None on record
ELIZABETH JOYCE FOX Trustee
None on record