THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WRITTLE

Charity number: 1130967
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Responsible for co-operating with the incumbent in promoting,within the ecclesiastical parish, the whole mission of the Church, pastorally, evangelistically, socially & ecumenically

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £105,000
Total expenditure: £95,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ALL SAINTS WRITTLE (Working name)
  • THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF WRITTLE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Anthony David Cant Chair 04 December 2019
THE WRITTLE BLENCOWE EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
WRITTLE RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
SALLY ANN CANSDALE Trustee 29 May 2024
None on record
CHRIS MOSS Trustee 29 May 2024
None on record
Frances Carol Lloyd Trustee 13 July 2022
THE WRITTLE BLENCOWE EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Michele Moody Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Philip E Couch Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
heather jane cooley Trustee 13 May 2019
WRITTLE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
Hazel Gwendoline Kempton Trustee 24 April 2017
None on record
Dr GEOFFREY CLARKE Trustee 23 September 2013
ESSEX CHRISTIAN HEALING TRUST
Received: On time
FORTH (FOR FURTHERANCE OF RHEUMATIC THERAPY)
Received: 20 days late
DIANA ROSAMUND DAY Trustee 27 July 2012
None on record
ANTHONY LEONARD RIPTON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £178.02k £112.72k £134.36k £181.92k £105.00k
Total expenditure £108.28k £141.45k £111.42k £155.04k £95.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £3.03k £4.40k £1.00k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 14 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 11 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 Mallard Road
CHELMSFORD
CM2 8AR
Phone:
01245267852