THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRISTCHURCH BUSHMEAD LUTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic and social in the parish of Christchurch Bushmead and also the wider area of Luton
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Luton
Governance
- 09 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
- CHRISTCHURCH BUSHMEAD PCC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carolyn Thomas | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Molina | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Luke Molina | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Johnson | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Brendan Roche | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Caroline Watts | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Timothy Philip Madeley | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Betty Adhokorie | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth Roche | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
DR DAVID DALLINGER | Trustee | 18 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINA DAWN PEARCE | Trustee | 24 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
WENDY ANN PECK | Trustee | 20 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.38k | £102.66k | £88.67k | £98.61k | £114.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.58k | £106.21k | £88.26k | £89.73k | £112.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.51k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hancock Drive
LUTON
LU2 7SF
- Phone:
- 01582454081
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window