THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, NORTH FERRIBY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Anglican Parish Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 04 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ALL SAINTS' CHURCH PCC, NORTH FERRIBY (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NAOMI WARD | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
JEAN SUSAN HENDERSON | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS GARY DEAN | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE ANN DAVIES | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|||||
SUSAN IDA HOGGARD | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lester Bartlett | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
VIOLET MAY COOK | Trustee | 15 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
JAMES ROBERTSON INNES | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Peter David Greenfield | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Dixon | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Greenfield | Trustee | 21 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
REVEREND MATTHEW CHARLES BRAILSFORD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.08k | £76.97k | £127.08k | £117.24k | £117.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £115.52k | £158.52k | £137.38k | £135.80k | £112.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.50k | N/A | £12.96k | £1.60k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALL SAINTS PARISH HALL
19 CHURCH ROAD
NORTH FERRIBY
HU14 3DA
- Phone:
- 01482635758
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window