THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, EAST FINCHLEY

Charity Number: 1130392
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £71,920
Total expenditure: £98,154

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnet
  • Haringey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 June 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ALL SAINTS' PCC, EAST FINCHLEY (Working name)
  • THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, EAST FINCHELY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rosalind Kay Tillier Trustee 14 April 2024
None on record
Richard William Edward Doman Trustee 14 April 2024
None on record
The Venerable Ian Nigel Chandler Trustee 23 February 2020
CHICHESTER THEOLOGICAL TRUST
Received: On time
ADDITIONAL CURATES SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Nicholas James Starling Trustee 20 November 2019
None on record
Francesca Ross Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Johanna Law Trustee 27 April 2014
None on record
SALLY THERESE ATKINSON MBE Trustee 08 July 2013
BARNET WAR MEMORIALS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
MONKEN HADLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
THE BEACON LODGE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Jennifer Mary Daybell Trustee 05 June 2011
None on record
BRIAN CHARLES HOOPER Trustee
None on record
Rev RICHARD ARTHUR JOHN BUCKINGHAM Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £368.35k £123.36k £100.28k £99.32k £71.92k
Total expenditure £424.78k £111.68k £110.17k £145.12k £98.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 02 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 02 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 April 2024 175 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 23 April 2024 175 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 02 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ALL SAINTS VICARAGE
TWYFORD AVENUE
LONDON
N2 9NH
Phone:
02088839315