KENNET AND TEST VALLEY METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity Number: 1132306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The provision of regular public acts of worship open to members of the church and non-members alike. The teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Pastoral work including visiting the sick and bereaved. Promotion of Christianity through the staging of events and services.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £188,268
Total expenditure: £377,941

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire
  • West Berkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 October 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • NEWBURY AND HUNGERFORD METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

36 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev RACHEL JANE BORGARS Chair 01 September 2016
SOUTHAMPTON METHODIST DISTRICT
Received: On time
Berkshire and Hampshire Borders Methodist Circuit
Received: On time
Louise Ann Porton Trustee 25 January 2024
None on record
Marilyn Irene Britt Trustee 24 May 2023
None on record
Christine Anne Marsh Trustee 24 May 2023
None on record
Michael Leslie Mitchell Trustee 12 May 2022
None on record
Lynn Portwood Trustee 26 January 2022
BEENHAM WIND ORCHESTRA
Received: On time
Christine Ann Westcombe Trustee 26 January 2022
None on record
Janice Evelyn Scott Trustee 26 January 2022
None on record
SARAH JOY ROSS Trustee 26 January 2022
Berkshire and Hampshire Borders Methodist Circuit
Received: On time
Judith Elizabeth Cole Trustee 26 January 2022
THAMES WATER TRUST FUND
Received: On time
Helen Batterby Trustee 15 September 2021
Berkshire and Hampshire Borders Methodist Circuit
Received: On time
Joanne Lesley Murray Trustee 15 September 2021
None on record
Roy Batterby Trustee 15 September 2021
None on record
ALISON MARGARET HUTCHINS Trustee 01 September 2021
Berkshire and Hampshire Borders Methodist Circuit
Received: On time
Judith Ann Mitchell Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Jeanette Louise Smith Trustee 01 September 2019
Berkshire and Hampshire Borders Methodist Circuit
Received: On time
Rev Andrew David Fitchet Trustee 01 September 2019
Berkshire and Hampshire Borders Methodist Circuit
Received: On time
AFFIRM: BAPTISTS TOGETHER FOR LGBT+ INCLUSION
Received: On time
Raymond Hoyle Trustee 01 September 2018
KINTBURY CORONATION VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
KINTBURY VOLUNTEER GROUP
Received: On time
PIED PIPER PRE-SCHOOL
Received: On time
Karen Anne Frost Trustee 01 September 2018
Berkshire and Hampshire Borders Methodist Circuit
Received: On time
Julia Ruth Mundin Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Stuart James Armstrong Trustee 26 January 2017
Berkshire and Hampshire Borders Methodist Circuit
Received: On time
Tandy Elizabeth Davies Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
REVD DR PETER JAMES HOWSON BSc MA MBA Trustee 16 January 2016
None on record
RICHARD JOHN KELLY Trustee 16 January 2016
Berkshire and Hampshire Borders Methodist Circuit
Received: On time
STUDY OF PARLIAMENT GROUP
Received: On time
Janet Woodward Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
HELEN MITCHELL WATSON Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
CONSTANCE JANICE SCHOFIELD Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
Joan Rosemary Greenhalgh Trustee 21 January 2014
Berkshire and Hampshire Borders Methodist Circuit
Received: On time
HELEN MARY COOK Trustee 15 January 2012
None on record
ANDREW JOHN BILLINGTON Trustee
Berkshire and Hampshire Borders Methodist Circuit
Received: On time
JENNIFER MARY BARTTER Trustee
Berkshire and Hampshire Borders Methodist Circuit
Received: On time
DAVID BEN VAUGHAN Trustee
None on record
Rev JENNIFER MARGARET ELLIS Trustee
None on record
STEPHEN PAUL GREENHALGH Trustee
None on record
CHRISTINE THOMAS Trustee
None on record
DORIS LILIAN VAUGHAN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £314.15k £148.38k £372.96k £199.10k £188.27k
Total expenditure £264.04k £364.36k £362.57k £334.51k £377.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 23 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 23 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 25 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 25 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 22 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 22 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 29 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 26 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
11 Lapwing Rise
Whitchurch
RG28 7SU
Phone:
01256895878