MOUNTAINWISE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To provide Duke of Edinburgh Award Expedition programmes and/or other educational and recreational activities as a means of: 2. To advance the education of the public, in particular but not exclusively in the subject of the physical and natural environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
- Throughout London
Governance
- 07 November 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BILLIE CHAN | Chair |
|
||||||
MARIA GANDY | Trustee |
|
||||||
JAMES HEWSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
KAREN LONG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HARRY WHELAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £181.47k | £113.69k | £232.38k | £245.36k | £284.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £218.78k | £170.02k | £173.03k | £231.99k | £262.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 November 2020 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 November 2020 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 OCTOBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 22 JUNE AND 11 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE DUKE OF EDINBURGH AWARD EXPEDITION PROGRAMMES AND/OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: A) PROMOTING THE MENTAL, SPIRITUAL, MORAL AND PHYSICAL EDUCATION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 AND TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS RESPONSIBLE MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. B) PRESERVING AND PROTECTING HEALTH FOR VULNERABLE ADULTS AND THOSE WITH MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES IN ORDER THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE SUBJECT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT"
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 ALLEN ROAD
LONDON
N16 8SB
- Phone:
- 07946320150
- Email:
- james@mountainwise.co.uk
- Website:
-
mountainwise.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window