PURLEY UNITED REFORMED CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Public Worship; learning about the Christian faith, including Bible Study and discussion; children's activities with a Christian focus; pastoral care of members of our own congregation and others; social responsibility action; social activities - all within a framework of openness and acceptance of all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
38 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Croydon
Governance
- 26 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 08 January 2025: Funds received from 802295 PURLEY YOUTH PROJECT
- PURLEY URC CHARITY (Working name)
- PURLEY UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev RUSSELL JAMES FURLEY-SMITH | Chair |
|
||||||
JOHN HAROLD DENISON | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Christopher Francis George | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Christopher Wiggs | Trustee | 26 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Irmina Hughes | Trustee | 26 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Julia Harris | Trustee | 20 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin Day | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Mander | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ann-Louise Willmer | Trustee | 23 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Frances Harrison | Trustee | 24 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £168.70k | £163.78k | £161.22k | £290.37k | £343.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £176.32k | £139.19k | £145.01k | £314.99k | £187.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.69k | £4.05k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUSTS DISTILLED FROM THE UNITED REFORM CHURCH ACTS OF PARLIAMENT (1972 AND 1982) AND THE SCHEME OF UNION (1972)
Charitable objects
The object of the Charity is the advancement of the Christian faith for the benefit of the public in accordance with the Scheme of Union of the United Reformed Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
PURLEY UNITED REFORMED CHURCH
906 BRIGHTON ROAD
PURLEY
CR8 2LN
- Phone:
- 02086609371
- Email:
- purleyURchurch@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window