THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WORTH, POUND HILL & MAIDENBOWER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIGOUS ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 12 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
- WORTH PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev MICHAEL JOHN BOAG | Chair | 02 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID LEWIS FRY | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Gordon Martin Winn Parry | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Francis John Michael Pole | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Donald Edward Hewerdine | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Norma Stanford | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anita Bhargava Wilkinson | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sebastian Pelissier | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Greta Jane Sawyer | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Ian Anderson | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sarah Upchurch | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
COLIN STEPHEN SMITH | Trustee | 04 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £464.97k | £202.19k | £222.10k | £189.08k | £168.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £218.19k | £299.51k | £230.31k | £183.72k | £354.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £576 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Barnabas Church
Worth Road
CRAWLEY
RH10 7DY
- Phone:
- 03001118150
- Email:
- office@worthparish.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window