THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST AUGUSTINE, HIGHBURY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We seek to enable ordinary people to live out their faith as part of our parish community through worship and prayer, learning about the Gospel, and provision of pastoral care for people living in the parish.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Islington
Governance
- 13 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST AUGUSTINE'S PCC, HIGHBURY (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev GABRIEL ARTHUR MARIE ANSTIS | Chair | 24 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Maria del Carmen Lopez | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Cyril Howell | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Taylor Allan Burns | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chi Hang Suen | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Micah David Judish | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Brown | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yemi Olowojoba | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Bisek | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Monty Sachikonye | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judith Ann Harwood | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nina Papazyan | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Verona Turnbull | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £183.34k | £137.18k | £174.80k | £225.94k | £184.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £197.18k | £146.24k | £154.84k | £237.60k | £168.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Augustine Parish Church
108 Highbury New Park
LONDON
N5 2DR
- Phone:
- 02073545515
- Email:
- office@stac.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window