HAYDON BRIDGE AND HAYDON PARISH DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion for the benefit of the public of urban and rural regeneration in areas of social and economic deprivation and in particular Haydon Bridge and Haydon Parish in the County of Northumberland. Current activities include running of Community Library and Visitor Information Point, and Community website for Haydon Parish www.haydon-bridge.co.uk
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northumberland
Governance
- 26 March 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Wendy Thompson | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Siobhan Elizabeth Stephenson | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Bates | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Michael Sadgrove | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Christina Taylor | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Philip Hartley | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
IAN FOSTER | Trustee | 13 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
PETER FLETCHER | Trustee | 31 March 2010 |
|
|
||||
PETER EDWIN FLETCHER BA HONS | Trustee | 12 March 2010 |
|
|
||||
HENRY SWADDLE MIET | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ESMOND JAMES FAULKS M.A | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS KATE MINTO | Trustee |
|
||||||
Stephen Mark I'Anson | Trustee |
|
||||||
WILLIAM MOFFITT RUTHERFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.42k | £17.12k | £14.02k | £15.21k | £23.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.08k | £14.21k | £15.80k | £17.89k | £24.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY ARE THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF URBAN AND RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION AND IN PARTICULAR IN HAYDON BRIDGE AND HAYDON PARISH, IN THE COUNTY OF NORTHUMBERLAND ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; (C) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; (D) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; (E) THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORICAL OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE; (F) THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ADVANCING EDUCATION IN ISSUES RELATING TO CLIMATE CHANGE AND ENVIRONMENTAL ISSUES INCLUDING THE PRODUCTION OF ENERGY FROM RENEWABLE RESOURCES; (G)SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
HAYDON BRIDGE AND HAYDON PARISH, IN THE COUNTY OF NORTHUMBERLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Haydon Bridge Development Trust
Haydon Bridge Library
Church Street
Haydon Bridge
HEXHAM
Northumb
- Phone:
- 07968488521
- Email:
- peterfletcher32@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window