RAHAB PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pastoral care and practical support to women affected by prostitution and human trafficking for the purpose of sexual exploitation. Founded in 2009 under the leadership of Sisters Adoratrices, the charity is a continued expression of the Sisters' unique charism & apostolic mission, which is over 150 years old with currently 153 social projects in 23 countries supporting over 11,000 women annually.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 22 October 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Hyland OBE | Chair | 19 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sister Maria Luisa Puglisi | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
SISTER DOLY MATHEW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Fr Matthew Blake OCD | Trustee |
|
||||||
SISTER ANTONIA LOPEZ ARROYO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £266.34k | £238.72k | £117.33k | £84.04k | £145.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £213.49k | £198.14k | £108.45k | £127.08k | £101.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: (A) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE AT RISK OF, INVOLVED IN OR AFFECTED BY SEXUAL EXPLOITATION; (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE FOLLOWING SUBJECTS AND RELATED ISSUES:- (I) SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE; (II) SEXUAL EXPLOITATION; AND THEIR IMPACT IN SOCIETY; (C) THE PROMOTION OF SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVE CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS ARE RECOGNISED BY THE LAW FROM TIME TO TIME AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE. (B) THE VALUES AND BELIEFS OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; AND (C) THE CHARITY'S MISSION STATEMENT AS FROM TIME TO TIME ADOPTED BY THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rahab Project Ltd
PWW Solicitors
84 Eccleston Square
LONDON
SW1V 1PX
- Phone:
- 02073703901
- Email:
- contact@rahabuk.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window