THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY'S WYTHALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St. Mary's Wythall is a local Parish Church, promoting in the Ecclesiastical Parish the whole mission of the church. We hold Sunday and mid-week services, groups for prayer, Bible study and friendship. We run events for the elderly, after-school clubs with a Christian theme, youth clubs and a baby & toddler group. We support local and overseas charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,800 from 2 government grant(s)
People

16 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 19 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST. MARY'S WYTHALL PCC (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Brockbank | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Enid Clark | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Llinos Looker | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Francis Harrison | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Anthony Featherstone | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Darby | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amanda Clare Chishdon Dauncey | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Arkell | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Parsons | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Annette Croxford | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Rogers | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Amanda Jane Featherstone | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judith Emery | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Spencer | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA MABEL MILLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £166.19k | £160.95k | £179.91k | £210.09k | £204.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £164.73k | £155.53k | £162.88k | £162.73k | £210.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Marys Church
Shawhurst Lane
Hollywood
BIRMINGHAM
B47 5JN
- Phone:
- 01564823248
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window