Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY'S WYTHALL
Charity number: 1132792

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Brockbank | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Enid Clark | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Llinos Looker | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Francis Harrison | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Anthony Featherstone | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Darby | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amanda Clare Chishdon Dauncey | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Arkell | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Parsons | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Annette Croxford | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Rogers | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Amanda Jane Featherstone | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judith Emery | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Spencer | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA MABEL MILLER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.