THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, WISTASTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Church of England parish church providing worship and pastoral work with in the local church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

16 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 17 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARY'S PCC, WISTATON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev MICHAEL FRANCIS TURNBULL BTH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Susan Steele | Trustee | 06 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Robert Charles Irving Squirrell | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Catherine Susan Gallagher | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Rhodes | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Dawes | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Dawn Horne | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Frances Mary Latham | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Joanna Squirrell | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Shephard | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAPHNE GREGORY | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR MIKE FELTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID ANTHONY ILLING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS ANN STUBBS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HOWARD BARKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIMON ASHLEY BARTHOLOMEW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.06k | £112.38k | £246.68k | £139.12k | £127.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.75k | £140.11k | £135.05k | £145.75k | £117.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 March 2022 | 137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 March 2022 | 137 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Marys Church Hall
Church Lane
Wistaston
CREWE
CW2 8HA
- Phone:
- 01270567119
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window