Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, EALING
Charity number: 1131598

Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV DAVID EDWARD NENO | Chair | 27 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Harris | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Richard Martin | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Ernest David Grant | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Allison McAllister | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cornelia Agnes Harding | Trustee | 23 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Saira Salimi | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Megan McAllister | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Crompton Peatfield | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark James | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Pridgeon | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Simon Philip Baker | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANN LAZAROW | Trustee | 23 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Linda Foster | Trustee | 31 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JEAN PEATFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REVD DR MARGARET JOACHIM | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.