Accounts and annual returns LIVING WORD MISSIONARY CHURCH - UK

Charity number: 1131304
Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 December 2024 322 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 18 December 2024 322 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 April 2024 433 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 08 April 2024 433 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 January 2022 355 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 January 2022 355 days late Download Open in new window