Financial history LIVING WORD MISSIONARY CHURCH - UK

Charity number: 1131304
Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £78.23k £57.74k £47.30k £28.34k £52.41k
Total expenditure £87.04k £80.90k £48.00k £39.42k £49.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £19.69k N/A N/A