THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL HIGHGATE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious Activities within the Parish of St Michael Highgate
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

12 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Camden
- Haringey
Governance
- 03 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST MICHAEL HIGHGATE PCC (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mike Powell | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hanaan Marwah | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew George CLODE | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Alexander Timothy Matthew Ollier | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Brading | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
OLAKUNLE AYODELE AYODEJI | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Simon Owen | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Julia Rigby | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR Karen Sennett FRCGP | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM JOHN MCGREGOR | Trustee | 24 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
REV JOHN HOWARD PICTON ROGERS | Trustee | 30 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS FRANCIS WALEY SANDERSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £354.07k | £372.66k | £315.24k | £312.48k | £365.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £300.94k | £116.29k | £384.52k | £281.24k | £297.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 181 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 181 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 August 2024 | 283 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 August 2024 | 283 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MICHAELS CHURCH
SOUTH GROVE
LONDON
N6 6BJ
- Phone:
- 02083407279
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window