Financial history WARMINSTER AND DISTRICT FOOD BANK

Charity number: 1131708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.69k £57.73k £40.70k £41.83k £36.22k
Total expenditure £19.86k £34.01k £33.19k £23.39k £36.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.00k £500 N/A N/A