Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF KING CHARLES THE MARTYR POTTERS BAR

Charity Number: 1130748
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £118.10k £86.26k £95.60k £136.00k £147.53k
Total expenditure £145.21k £135.90k £139.85k £152.50k £151.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A