THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF KIRKBY

Charity number: 1130754
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The advancement of religion in the Kirkby area of Liverpool by means of church services and activities which involve the local communities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £102,863
Total expenditure: £101,528

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Knowsley

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • PCC KIRKBY (Working name)
  • THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF KIRKBY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROSE ANN WILSON Trustee 19 May 2024
None on record
ANDREW STEPHEN WILSON Trustee 21 May 2023
RAISE LIMITED
Received: On time
EDITH CAROLINE COLLINS Trustee 22 May 2022
ALL SAINTS CHILDREN'S VENTURES LIMITED
Received: On time
CENTRE 63 KIRKBY
Received: On time
Kirsten Elizabeth Collins Trustee 22 May 2022
None on record
Denise Wilma Hayden Trustee 22 May 2022
None on record
Vera Hudson Trustee 22 May 2022
None on record
Jillian Ridgeway Trustee 22 May 2022
None on record
David Ridgeway Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
David Harold Patterson Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Rev Anne Lawlor Trustee 15 October 2017
None on record
Rev PHILIPPA CLARE LEA Trustee 02 September 2013
MILLBROOK PARK MILLENNIUM GREEN
Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days
ANN COLLINSON Trustee 13 June 2012
CHURCH IN CENTRE, KIRKBY
Received: On time
MARGARET EDITH MYLES Trustee
None on record
Paul Jeffrey Collins Trustee
ALL SAINTS CHILDREN'S VENTURES LIMITED
Received: On time
HUYTON DEANERY
Recently registered
JEREMY DAVID FAGAN Trustee
CENTRE 63 KIRKBY
Received: On time
JEAN WILLIAMS Trustee
MILLBROOK PARK MILLENNIUM GREEN
Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £313.45k £138.16k £86.76k £94.40k £102.86k
Total expenditure £306.06k £109.38k £96.26k £84.25k £101.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £214.63k £36.88k £32.20k N/A £6.47k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 17 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 January 2024 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 11 January 2024 72 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 November 2022 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 09 November 2022 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
27 SHAKESPEARE AVENUE
KIRKBY
LIVERPOOL
L32 9SH
Phone:
01515472133