THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE HOLY AND UNDIVIDED TRINITY OSSETT AND GAWTHORPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are the Anglican Church (Church of England) in the north Ossett and Gawthorpe, West Yorkshire. We operate from two buildings - a Grade 2* listed Church and a multi-purpose Church centre. We serve the people of the parish in multiple ways and open all of our buildings to meet the needs of the local community. We are a welcoming community, inclusive of all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £8,907 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 03 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- OSSETT & GAWTHORPE PCC (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Anne Grayson | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL BEAUMONT | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joan Russell-Hogley | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Wright | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PETER MICHAEL HOLDEN | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
June Milburn | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Nicky Fleming | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mark Sayle | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALDENE JANE SMITH | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
TONY SHACKLETON | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
DUNCAN RICHARD SMITH | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £252.03k | £111.42k | £153.69k | £176.28k | £191.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £305.02k | £93.81k | £153.68k | £169.42k | £183.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £17.43k | £13.40k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £17.43k | £13.40k | £8.91k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 April 2023 | 170 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 April 2023 | 170 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 February 2021 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 February 2021 | 105 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Fearnley Avenue
Ossett
WF5 9ET
- Phone:
- 01924219486
- Email:
- office@trinityossett.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window