OLTON BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
During our Sunday service we hold a full programme of children's classes for all ages. We also run: - Small groups for attendees to meet, pray together, grow in faith etc. - A popular toddlers group which also demonstrates the love of Jesus Christ - Youth events and groups aimed at teenagers - Membership and Baptismal courses We provide support to other charities and Christian mission work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Solihull
Governance
- 22 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
- OBC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Roger Hopton | Chair | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nina Susan Clark | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Joseph David Belcher | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ogemdi Ndudi Ekwegh | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Mcclelland | Trustee | 29 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Nancy Johnston | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Diane Ford | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAUL CHEESMAN FCIPD | Trustee | 23 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £146.52k | £123.74k | £102.36k | £87.78k | £137.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.40k | £93.10k | £107.42k | £97.93k | £120.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 JUNE 2009
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BRANCH
85 Warwick Road
SOLIHULL
B92 7HP
- Phone:
- 0121 707 5722
- Email:
- info@oltonbaptist.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window