Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LONGFLEET (ST MARY'S), POOLE

Charity Number: 1130469
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £595.71k £552.52k £618.54k £674.20k £720.16k
Total expenditure £554.72k £550.50k £583.62k £620.25k £705.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.79k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £552.44k £506.78k £538.62k £547.17k £605.33k
Income - Other trading activities £36.10k £38.50k £70.64k £110.79k £94.90k
Income - Charitable activities £984 £1.39k £701 £1.21k £311
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6.19k £5.85k £8.58k £14.10k £19.63k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £934 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £200 £0 £0 £20.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £536.89k £532.92k £555.71k £583.25k £664.09k
Expenditure - Raising funds £17.83k £17.59k £27.91k £36.99k £41.29k
Expenditure - Governance £1.80k £1.80k £1.80k £1.80k £1.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £43.73k £38.42k £50.41k £39.23k £38.35k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0