Parochial Church Council of the ecclesiastical parish of St Wilfrid, Calverley, Leeds

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer regular public worship, open to all. Pastoral work, visiting the sick and bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses, small groups and religious assemblies in schools. Promotion of Christianity through events, meetings and the provision of activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers. We support UK and overseas charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leeds City
Governance
- 03 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 20 March 2025: Funds received from 516863 WOODHALL HILLS SUNDAY SCHOOL CHARITY
- CALVERLEY PARISH CHURCH PCC (Working name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. WILFRID, CALVERLEY, BRADFORD. (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Rob Denton | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Faith Pollard | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kim Pollard | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Simkins | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Lacey | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Edward Jobes | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kimberley Raja | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Pickard | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Hainsworth | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Cohen | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Janice Tempest | Trustee | 21 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.73k | £115.43k | £140.71k | £130.36k | £137.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £127.61k | £118.79k | £168.96k | £143.83k | £134.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 January 2023 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 January 2023 | 73 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 November 2021 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 November 2021 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES as amended on 09 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Calverley Parish Church
Town Gate
Calverley
Pudsey
Leeds
LS28 5NF
- Phone:
- 07774149649
- Email:
- info@calverleyparish.church
- Website:
-
calverleyparish.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window