THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, LEIGHTON BUZZARD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Parochial Church Council has the responsibility of co-operating with the incumbent in promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 19 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ALL SAINTS, LEIGHTON BUZZARD (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David MacGeoch | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Pearce | Trustee | 27 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Legg | Trustee | 27 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Cox | Trustee | 27 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Tingay Mr | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Marchant | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Amy Tingay | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Major | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carol Yirrell | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Linda Kagunga | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Rudom | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan Perrott | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Samuel David Grahame Smith | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr Stephen Jury | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Munford | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
John Edward Sykes | Trustee | 27 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Ralph Huskisson | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
LINDSAY BEVIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £322.21k | £206.75k | £215.05k | £244.03k | £233.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £270.22k | £225.43k | £225.15k | £238.56k | £239.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Parish Office
All Saints Church
Church Square
LEIGHTON BUZZARD
LU7 1AE
- Phone:
- 01525381418
- Email:
- parish@allsaintslb.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window