THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS, PENKRIDGE

Charity number: 1131086
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

MAKES GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS MAKES GRANTS TO ORGANISATIONS PROVIDES BUILDINGS/FACILITIES/OPEN SPACE PROVIDES SERVICES

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £140,565
Total expenditure: £138,497

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST MICHAEL'S PCC, PENKRIDGE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GREG YERBURY Chair 28 October 2013
ROSCOW FOLD ENDOWED SCHOOL
Received: On time
PENKRIDGE SPORTS & RECREATION CENTRE(MONCKTON)
Received: 57 days late
Carole Elaine French Trustee 24 May 2022
None on record
Mary Gwendolyn Trustee 16 November 2021
None on record
Ian Price Trustee 16 November 2021
None on record
CHRISTINE MARGARET BEARDMORE Trustee 20 October 2020
None on record
AMANDA MARY ARTHUR Trustee 29 June 2020
None on record
David Christopher Knaggs Trustee 29 May 2019
None on record
Philip Haime Trustee 29 April 2019
None on record
Claire Holden Trustee 29 April 2019
None on record
DAVID STEVEN SPENCER Trustee 21 October 2013
None on record
HELEN ELIZABETH PALFREY Trustee 21 October 2013
J H HAYES TRUST (TRUST 1086)
Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days
THE MOTHERS' UNION DIOCESE OF LICHFIELD
Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days
JOHN HOWARD LINNEY Trustee 14 April 2013
None on record
ROGER MAIDEN Trustee
None on record
EDWARD GEORGE HODKINSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £184.79k £112.00k £96.22k £111.27k £140.57k
Total expenditure £156.02k £143.02k £91.81k £114.11k £138.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.50k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 14 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Rectory
New Road
Penkridge
Stafford
ST19 5DN
Phone:
01785714001
Website:

No information available