ROCK BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rock is an evangelical church, affiliated to the FIEC and meeting at Morley Memorial School each Sunday, working in the community around south Cambridge in particular, whilst supporting workers across the globe.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 23 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Griffin | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Lancaster | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith Proffitt | Trustee | 06 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian Hayden-Smith | Trustee | 09 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL PARTRIDGE | Trustee | 26 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ACKROYD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GLENFORD MAPP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £133.44k | £156.81k | £155.45k | £155.45k | £173.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.19k | £161.22k | £163.04k | £163.04k | £189.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 28 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24 FEBRUARY 2000
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE:- (A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN CAMBRIDGE AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID COUNTY AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT (C) TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN THE SAID COUNTY AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT 5. IN FURTHERANCE OF THE SAID OBJECTS BUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE THE FOLLOWING POWERS:- (I) TO PURCHASE LEASE HIRE EXCHANGE OR OTHERWISE ACQUIRE ANY LAND BUILDINGS FURNITURE EQUIPMENT OR OTHER PROPERTY TO BE USED FOR THE PURPOSE OF THE TRUST AND (SUBJECT TO SUCH CONSENTS AS MAY BE REQUIRED BY LAW) TO IMPROVE RESELL LET UNDERLET OR OTHERWISE DEAL WITH THE SAME (II) TO EMPLOY OR OTHERWISE ENGAGE THE SERVICES OF AND REMUNERATE ANY PERSON OR PERSONS TO SUPERVISE ORGANISE AND CARRY ON THE WORK AUTHORISED BY THE TRUSTEES AND TO PROVIDE SUCH PERSON OR PERSONS WITH ACCOMMODATION AND OTHER FACILITIES FOR CARRYING OUT THEIR WORK AND AS EMPLOYERS OF STAFF TO MAKE ALL REASONABLE AND NECESSARY PROVISION FOR THE PAYMENT OF PENSIONS AND SUPERANNUATION TO OR ON BEHALF OF EMPLOYEES AND THEIR WIDOWS OR OTHER DEPENDANTS PROVIDING THAT NO TRUSTEE SHALL RECEIVE REMUNERATION FROM THE TRUST SAVE AS MAY BE HEREINAFTER SPECIFICALLY PROVIDED (III) TO MAKE DONATIONS TO ANY CHRISTIAN WORKER WHO IS ENGAGED IN SUCH WORK OR ACTIVITY WHICH FURTHERS THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST OR IN ASSISTING EITHER DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY IN THE SAME (IV) TO MAKE DONATIONS OR LOANS TO OTHER CHARITIES HAVING THE SAME OR SIMILAR OBJECTS AS THE TRUST (V) TO CO-OPERATE AND COLLABORATE WITH OTHER CHARITIES HAVING THE SAME OR SIMILAR OBJECTS AS THE TRUST AND TO EXCHANGE INFORMATION AND ADVICE (VI) TO PRODUCE SELL OR OTHERWISE DISTRIBUTE LITERATURE AUDIO AND VISUAL AIDS AND OTHER MEDIA OF COMMUNICATION BUT NOT SO AS TO CONSTITUTE PERMANENT TRADING ON THE PART OF THE TRUSTEES EXCEPT WHERE IT IS A DIRECT MEANS OF ACHIEVING THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST (VII) TO ARRANGE AND PROVIDE FOR OR JOIN IN ARRANGING AND PROVIDING FOR THE HOLDING OF MEETINGS LECTURES SEMINARS CONFERENCES AND TRAINING COURSES FOR THE FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST (VIII) TO RAISE FUNDS AND INVITE AND RECEIVE CONTRIBUTIONS FROM ANY PERSONS WHATSOEVER BY WAY OF LOAN SUBSCRIPTION DONATION AND OTHERWISE PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL NOT UNDERTAKE ANY PERMANENT TRADING ACTIVITIES IN RAISING FUNDS FOR THE SAID OBJECTS (IX) TO MAKE REGULATIONS FOR THE MANAGEMENT OF ANY PROPERTY WHICH MAY BE ACQUIRED BY THE TRUST (X) TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER LAWFUL THINGS AS ARE NECESSARY TO ATTAIN THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST
Area of benefit
CAMBRIDGE, UNITED KINGDOM, THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
115 Coldhams Lane
CAMBRIDGE
CB1 3JB
- Phone:
- 07593546491
- Email:
- office@rock-baptist.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window