EDEN COUNSELLING AND COMMUNITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer 1 to 1 Counselling for children, young people and adults. Also Family Therapy, Group Work and training courses for parents, carers or professionals working with children and young people to give a better understanding of emotional well being and mental health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 21 January 2010: Standard registration
- 15 August 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- TIME 4U (Working name)
- TIME 4U COUNSELLING AND COMMUNITY (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £193.94k | £247.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £166.87k | £224.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 17 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 17 January 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 14 December 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 14 December 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/06/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/12/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09/06/2011
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING GROUPS AND COURSES FOR CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS TO LEARN HOW TO MANAGE SPECIFIC EMOTIONAL NEEDS AND INTERPERSONAL SKILLS, PROVIDING LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES AND TRAINING FOR PARENTS/CARERS AND PROFESSIONALS WORKING WITH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND BY RESEARCHING AND COLLECTING DATA ON SPECIFIC GROUPS OF PEOPLE OR NEEDS. 2) TO ADVANCE THE HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND THERAPEUTIC SUPPORT AND WORKING COLLABORATIVELY AND IN PARTNERSHIP WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN PROVIDING MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES FOR CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS. 3) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE , LIVING IN DARTFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, THROUGH PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Area of benefit
DARTFORD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window