SOUTH DEVON ASPERGERS GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Social Interaction for children on the Autistic Spectrum. Therapy and life skills. Parents forum and siblings art activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,400 from 4 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
- Torbay
Governance
- 27 October 2009: Standard registration
- ASPERATIONS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Pitkin | Chair | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Amy Jackson | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Lock | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Suzanna Orchard-Barker | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.75k | £14.29k | £1.74k | £21.14k | £37.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.48k | £5.86k | £7.33k | £23.61k | £24.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.80k | N/A | N/A | £8.20k | £2.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 JULY 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 2 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THOSE DIAGNOSED WITH AN AUTISTIC SPECTRUM DISORDER (ASD) AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT AND SUCH OTHER ACTIVITIES OR SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 Robin Way
Kingsteignton
NEWTON ABBOT
Devon
TQ12 3FF
- Phone:
- 07719414729
- Email:
- admin@asperations.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window