Accounts and annual returns BERRIEW SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1130639
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 May 2024 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 February 2023 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 November 2022 293 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 April 2022 425 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required