HERON CORN MILL (BEETHAM) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The restoration of Heron Cornmill to its original form as a working water powered mill and preservation and display of the mill and equipment for educational benefit of students and the public and promoting renewable energy. Arrange lectures shows for the benefit of the public and to print publish and make available by sale or otherwise of literature reproductions photographs and the like.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
Governance
- 17 September 2009: Standard registration
- HERON CORN MILL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER BINGHAM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Robin Sykes | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Stella Elizabeth Adams-Schofield | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
George Winston Collinge | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Maddock | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Audrey Steeley | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT WILLIAM DICKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT PARKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £227.30k | £305.86k | £281.39k | £268.13k | £245.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £199.60k | £205.56k | £199.20k | £205.24k | £214.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £16.34k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/01/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/12/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/01/2012
Charitable objects
TO RESTORE, PRESERVE, AND UPKEEP THE HERON CORN MILL TO ITS ORIGINAL FORM AS A FULLY WORKING WATER POWERED CORN MILL - ON A SITE FIRST USED FOR A MILL IN THE 13TH CENTURY - AS A WORKING MUSEUM OPEN TO THE PUBLIC AND FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY, AND FOR THE EDUCATIONAL BENEFIT OF STUDENTS, RESEARCHERS AND OTHERS, AND ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES TENDING TO ENCOURAGE INTEREST IN THE HISTORY AND INDUSTRY OF THE AREA. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION, IMPROVEMENT, AND MUTUAL CO-DEPENDENCY OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY DEMONSTRATING AND PROMOTING THE USE OF RENEWABLE ENERGY TECHNOLOGY PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, USING HYDRO POWER. IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS, BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE POWER TO ARRANGE LECTURES, EXHIBITIONS, SHOWS AND EVENTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, AND TO PRINT, PUBLISH, AND MAKE AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC BY SALE OR OTHERWISE OF LITERATURE, REPRODUCTIONS, PHOTOGRAPHS AND THE LIKE.
Area of benefit
BEETHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
MILL LANE
BEETHAM
MILNTHORPE
CUMBRIA
LA7 7PQ
- Phone:
- 01539564271
- Email:
- info@heronmill.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window