ART 360 HEREFORD LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing opportunities in Herefordshire to take part in arts activities, providing display space and organising art workshops. Particularly working with disadvantaged young people and the elderly increasing life choices, community involvement, allowing self expression, tackling isolation, boosting self esteem. Also to support & show work of other artists and charitable groups to public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 30 November 2009: Standard registration
- 02 August 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- ART 360 (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.17k | £27.63k | £4.51k | £1.47k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.12k | £28.72k | £15.92k | £1.56k | £100 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | 30 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | 22 June 2017 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 JUNE 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 7 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROMOTE ART AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE ARTS INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO PAINTING DRAWING SCULPTING DRAMA DANCE SINGING AND MUSIC IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE VISUAL ARTS BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF ART DISPLAYS, EXHIBITIONS AND WORKSHOPS IN THE CITY OF HEREFORD AND ITS ENVIRONS. 3.2 SUCH OTHER PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
THE CITY OF HEREFORD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window